Link

Link

Link

Link

Arithmetic Aptitude | Numbers II - with Explanation


1
A number when divided successively by 4 and 5 leaves remainders 1 and 4 respectively. When it is successively divided by 5 and 4, then the respective remainders will be
A.1, 2
B.2, 3
C.3, 2
D.4, 1
Answer: Option B
Explanation:
 4 | x            y = (5 x 1 + 4) = 9
 --------
 5 | y -1         x = (4 x y + 1) = (4 x 9 + 1) = 37
 --------
   | 1 -4

 Now, 37 when divided successively by 5 and 4, we get

 5 | 37
 ---------
 4 | 7 - 2
 ---------
   | 1 - 3
 
 Respective remainders are 2 and 3.

2. 
8796 x 223 + 8796 x 77 = ?
A.2736900
B.2638800
C.2658560
D.2716740
E.None of these
Answer: Option B
Explanation:
8796 x 223 + 8796 x 77= 8796 x (223 + 77)   [Ref: By Distributive Law ]
= (8796 x 300)
= 2638800


3. 
8988 ÷ 8 ÷ 4 = ?
A.4494
B.561.75
C.2247
D.280.875
E.None of these
Answer: Option D
Explanation:
Given Exp. = 8988 x1x1=2247= 280.875
848
---------------------------------------------------------------------------------------------------

4
What is the unit digit in the product (365 x 659 x 771)?
A.1
B.2
C.4
D.6
Answer: Option C
Explanation:
Unit digit in 34 = 1  Unit digit in (34)16 = 1
 Unit digit in 365 = Unit digit in [ (34)16 x 3 ] = (1 x 3) = 3
Unit digit in 659 = 6
Unit digit in 74  Unit digit in (74)17 is 1.
Unit digit in 771 = Unit digit in [(74)17 x 73] = (1 x 3) = 3
 Required digit = Unit digit in (3 x 6 x 3) = 4.

5. 
3251 + 587 + 369 - ? = 3007
A.1250
B.1300
C.1375
D.1200
E.None of these
Answer: Option D
Explanation:
 3251          Let 4207 - x = 3007
+ 587          Then,  x = 4207 - 3007 = 1200
+ 369
 ----
 4207
 ----


0 comments:

Post a Comment